THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:07:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 220-4600 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON L4L 4Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-915-3100
Fax: 905-629-1654
Address: 10 Cottrelle Blvd
Unit 105
Brampton ON L6S 0E2
Phone: 705-915-3100
Fax: 905-497-2261

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gowing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gowing (CPSO#: 82610 )
Business Address: 50 Alliance Boulevard
Barrie Ontario L4M 5K3
(705) 728-9482
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6S7
(705) 728-9090
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201
Business Address: 60 Bell Farm Rd
Barrie ON L4M 5G6
705-728-8778
Business Address: 60 Bell Farm Rd, Unit 1
Barrie ON L5M 5G6
Business Address: 327 Charlotte St
Vascular Surgery
Suite 401
Peterborough ON K9J 0B2
705-775-8272

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 220-4600 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON L4L 4Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-915-3100
Fax: 905-629-1654
Address: 10 Cottrelle Blvd
Unit 105
Brampton ON L6S 0E2
Phone: 705-915-3100
Fax: 905-497-2261

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gowing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gowing (CPSO#: 82610 )
Business Address: 50 Alliance Boulevard
Barrie Ontario L4M 5K3
(705) 728-9482
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6S7
(705) 728-9090
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201
Business Address: 60 Bell Farm Rd
Barrie ON L4M 5G6
705-728-8778
Business Address: 60 Bell Farm Rd, Unit 1
Barrie ON L5M 5G6
Business Address: 327 Charlotte St
Vascular Surgery
Suite 401
Peterborough ON K9J 0B2
705-775-8272

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT NEIL GOWING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOWING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT NEIL GOWING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOWING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005