THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:14:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: Phillips, Jodi Lee (Used Until: 28 Jul 2008)
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brant Community Health Care System
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 21 Nov 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jodi McQueen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. McQueen (CPSO#: 82620 )
Business Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: Willett Hospital
238 Grand River Street North
Paris Ontario N3L 2N7
(519) 442-2251

General Information

Former Name: Phillips, Jodi Lee (Used Until: 28 Jul 2008)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brant Community Health Care System
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 21 Nov 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jodi McQueen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. McQueen (CPSO#: 82620 )
Business Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: Willett Hospital
238 Grand River Street North
Paris Ontario N3L 2N7
(519) 442-2251

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JODI LEE MCQUEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCQUEEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JODI LEE MCQUEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCQUEEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005