THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:23:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: Shukla, Shefalee (Used Until: 03 Apr 2011)
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20 - 2037 Long Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 806-6060
Fax: (705) 806-2223

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shefalee S. Kent Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kent (CPSO#: 82630 )
Business Address: 22-2037 Long Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 4M8

General Information

Former Name: Shukla, Shefalee (Used Until: 03 Apr 2011)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20 - 2037 Long Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 806-6060
Fax: (705) 806-2223

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shefalee S. Kent Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kent (CPSO#: 82630 )
Business Address: 22-2037 Long Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 4M8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEFALEE SHUKLA KENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEFALEE SHUKLA KENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005