THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:06:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Maria St
Tavistock ON N0B 2R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-655-2322
Fax: 519-655-3073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Caines Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Caines (CPSO#: 82662 )
Business Address: 107 - 444 Douro Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
(519) 273-0100
Business Address: 80 Maria St
Tavistock ON N0B 2R0
519-655-2322

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Maria St
Tavistock ON N0B 2R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-655-2322
Fax: 519-655-3073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Caines Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Caines (CPSO#: 82662 )
Business Address: 107 - 444 Douro Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
(519) 273-0100
Business Address: 80 Maria St
Tavistock ON N0B 2R0
519-655-2322

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA EVELYN CAINES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAINES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA EVELYN CAINES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAINES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005