THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:47:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2nd Floor Medical Clinics
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 521-4196
Fax: (416) 521-4082
Address: Medical Health System
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (416) 521-4196
Fax: (416) 521-4082

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Chakrabarti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chakrabarti (CPSO#: 82663 )
Business Address: Medical Health System
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(416) 521-4196
Business Address: Medical Clinics
2nd Floor
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
(416) 521-4196
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2nd Floor Medical Clinics
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 521-4196
Fax: (416) 521-4082
Address: Medical Health System
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (416) 521-4196
Fax: (416) 521-4082

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Chakrabarti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chakrabarti (CPSO#: 82663 )
Business Address: Medical Health System
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(416) 521-4196
Business Address: Medical Clinics
2nd Floor
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
(416) 521-4196
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUMONTRA CHAKRABARTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKRABARTI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUMONTRA CHAKRABARTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKRABARTI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005