THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:43:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 117-2291 Kipling Ave
Etobicoke ON M9W 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-933-9480
Fax: 416-545-0193
Address: Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lee Roth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Roth (CPSO#: 82666 )
Business Address: Suite 301
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
(647) 933-9480
Business Address: Suite 11-15
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
(905) 790-9030
Business Address: Suite 117A
2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale Ontario M9W 4L6
(416) 741-4545
Business Address: Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
(905) 856-2626
Business Address: 1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
(416) 350-3933

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 117-2291 Kipling Ave
Etobicoke ON M9W 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-933-9480
Fax: 416-545-0193
Address: Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lee Roth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Roth (CPSO#: 82666 )
Business Address: Suite 301
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
(647) 933-9480
Business Address: Suite 11-15
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
(905) 790-9030
Business Address: Suite 117A
2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale Ontario M9W 4L6
(416) 741-4545
Business Address: Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
(905) 856-2626
Business Address: 1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
(416) 350-3933

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEE STUART ROTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEE STUART ROTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005