THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:25:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L H S C University Hospital
Department of Clinical Neurological
Sciences Room B2 223
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 32911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Teneille Gofton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Gofton (CPSO#: 82669 )
Business Address: 485 Windermere Road
3rd Floor
London Ontario N5X 2T1
(519) 438-2102
Business Address: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Clinical Neurological Sciences
Room B10 - 108
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L H S C University Hospital
Department of Clinical Neurological
Sciences Room B2 223
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 32911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Teneille Gofton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Gofton (CPSO#: 82669 )
Business Address: 485 Windermere Road
3rd Floor
London Ontario N5X 2T1
(519) 438-2102
Business Address: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Clinical Neurological Sciences
Room B10 - 108
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TENEILLE EMMA GOFTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOFTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TENEILLE EMMA GOFTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOFTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005