THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:48:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: Beardsley, Kimberley (Used Until: 28 Jul 2008)
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2360 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4P 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 342-3552
Fax: Fax: (437) 702-0876
Address: 7330 Yonge St
Thornhill ON L4J 7Y7
Phone: 4169091036
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 29 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 29 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kimberley Garbedian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Garbedian (CPSO#: 82673 )
Business Address: 45 Old Orchard Grove
Toronto ON M5M 2C8
Business Address: Hannam Fertility Centre / TNI
160 Bloor Street East
15th Floor
Toronto Ontario M4W 3R2
Business Address: 2360 Yonge Street
Yonge
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E6
4169091036

General Information

Former Name: Beardsley, Kimberley (Used Until: 28 Jul 2008)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2360 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4P 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 342-3552
Fax: Fax: (437) 702-0876
Address: 7330 Yonge St
Thornhill ON L4J 7Y7
Phone: 4169091036
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 29 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 29 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kimberley Garbedian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Garbedian (CPSO#: 82673 )
Business Address: 45 Old Orchard Grove
Toronto ON M5M 2C8
Business Address: Hannam Fertility Centre / TNI
160 Bloor Street East
15th Floor
Toronto Ontario M4W 3R2
Business Address: 2360 Yonge Street
Yonge
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E6
4169091036

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY GARBEDIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARBEDIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY GARBEDIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARBEDIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005