THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:48:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 219 Mississaga Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 3B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 326-2443
Fax: (705) 326-2444

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 23 Nov 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Anand (CPSO#: 82678 )
Business Address: 219 Mississauga Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 3B6
(705) 326-2443

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 219 Mississaga Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 3B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 326-2443
Fax: (705) 326-2444

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 23 Nov 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Anand (CPSO#: 82678 )
Business Address: 219 Mississauga Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 3B6
(705) 326-2443

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NITASHA ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NITASHA ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005