THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-752-7871
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brantford General Hospital Brantford
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Brantford General Hospital
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Choi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Choi (CPSO#: 82683 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Business Address: Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
(613) 732-2811 Extn: 8096

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-752-7871
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brantford General Hospital Brantford
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Brantford General Hospital
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Choi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Choi (CPSO#: 82683 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Business Address: Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
(613) 732-2811 Extn: 8096

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABRAM CHOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABRAM CHOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005