THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:10:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 575-1300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Maternity Centre of Hamilton
100 Main Streeet West
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1H6
Phone: (905) 528-5553
Fax: (905) 528-9178

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amie Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Davis (CPSO#: 82685 )
Business Address: St. Joseph Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-4941
Business Address: 100 Main Street
2nd Floor
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1H6
(905) 528-5553
Business Address: 1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3J6
905) 574-1444
Business Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
(905) 632-3737

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 575-1300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Maternity Centre of Hamilton
100 Main Streeet West
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1H6
Phone: (905) 528-5553
Fax: (905) 528-9178

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amie Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Davis (CPSO#: 82685 )
Business Address: St. Joseph Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-4941
Business Address: 100 Main Street
2nd Floor
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1H6
(905) 528-5553
Business Address: 1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3J6
905) 574-1444
Business Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
(905) 632-3737

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIE JEANETTE DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIE JEANETTE DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005