THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:03:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: Fraser, Alexandra (Used Until: 11 Jun 2007)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 445-2550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 206
Huron St.
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1C3
Phone: (705) 445-2311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 189 St. Marie St.
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 3K4
Phone: (705) 444-6866
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fraser and Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fraser (CPSO#: 82690 ) Dr. J. Smith (CPSO#: 80973 )
Business Address: Suite 206
1 Huron Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1C3
(705) 445-2550
Business Address: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
(705) 445-2550

General Information

Former Name: Fraser, Alexandra (Used Until: 11 Jun 2007)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 445-2550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 206
Huron St.
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1C3
Phone: (705) 445-2311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 189 St. Marie St.
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 3K4
Phone: (705) 444-6866
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fraser and Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fraser (CPSO#: 82690 ) Dr. J. Smith (CPSO#: 80973 )
Business Address: Suite 206
1 Huron Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1C3
(705) 445-2550
Business Address: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
(705) 445-2550

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY ALEXANDRA FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY ALEXANDRA FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005