THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:27:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 312
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 591-1333
Fax: (416) 591-6333
Address: Suite 500
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5M 1C7
Phone: (416) 781-9500
Fax: (416) 781-7985
Address: Suite 305
9600 Bathurst Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 3Z8
Phone: (416)588-3788
Fax: (416)588-5633

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.P. Rambihar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rambihar (CPSO#: 82697 )
Business Address: 790 Bay Street
Suite 312
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 591-1333
Business Address: 500 - 491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5M 1C7
(416) 781-9500
Business Address: 9600 Bathurst St
Suite 305
Maple ON L6A 3Z8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 312
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 591-1333
Fax: (416) 591-6333
Address: Suite 500
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5M 1C7
Phone: (416) 781-9500
Fax: (416) 781-7985
Address: Suite 305
9600 Bathurst Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 3Z8
Phone: (416)588-3788
Fax: (416)588-5633

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.P. Rambihar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rambihar (CPSO#: 82697 )
Business Address: 790 Bay Street
Suite 312
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 591-1333
Business Address: 500 - 491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5M 1C7
(416) 781-9500
Business Address: 9600 Bathurst St
Suite 305
Maple ON L6A 3Z8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERRYN PRIYA RAMBIHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMBIHAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERRYN PRIYA RAMBIHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMBIHAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005