THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:34:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: UNIVERSITY OF JOS, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 104A
705 Grandview Street North
Oshawa Ontario L1K 0V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 725-1000
Fax: (905) 725-1080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria Udoeyop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Udoeyop (CPSO#: 82701 ) Dr. E. Udoeyop (CPSO#: 82259 )
Business Address: 222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
(905) 697-4805
Business Address: Unit 104A
705 Grandview Street North
Oshawa Ontario L1K 0V4
(905) 725-1000

Corporation Name: Emmanuel Udoeyop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Udoeyop (CPSO#: 82701 ) Dr. E. Udoeyop (CPSO#: 82259 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 2101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
(905) 697-4805
Business Address: 1000 Depalma Drive
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Maternal and child services
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
905-372-6811

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: UNIVERSITY OF JOS, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 104A
705 Grandview Street North
Oshawa Ontario L1K 0V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 725-1000
Fax: (905) 725-1080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria Udoeyop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Udoeyop (CPSO#: 82701 ) Dr. E. Udoeyop (CPSO#: 82259 )
Business Address: 222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
(905) 697-4805
Business Address: Unit 104A
705 Grandview Street North
Oshawa Ontario L1K 0V4
(905) 725-1000

Corporation Name: Emmanuel Udoeyop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Udoeyop (CPSO#: 82701 ) Dr. E. Udoeyop (CPSO#: 82259 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 2101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
(905) 697-4805
Business Address: 1000 Depalma Drive
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Maternal and child services
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
905-372-6811

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA INIMFON UDOEYOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UDOEYOP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA INIMFON UDOEYOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UDOEYOP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: UNIVERSITY OF JOS, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Feb 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2005