THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 02:50:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: Boisse, Lysa (Used Until: 15 Jan 2013)
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Helath Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 6242
Fax: (613) 548-2508

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boisse Lomax Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Boisse Lomax (CPSO#: 82715 )
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 6242
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 6242

General Information

Former Name: Boisse, Lysa (Used Until: 15 Jan 2013)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Helath Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 6242
Fax: (613) 548-2508

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boisse Lomax Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Boisse Lomax (CPSO#: 82715 )
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 6242
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 6242

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LYSA BOISSE LOMAX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOISSE LOMAX is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LYSA BOISSE LOMAX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOISSE LOMAX is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Feb 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005