THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:31:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 33 Lombard St
Suite 3902
Toronto ON M5C 3H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054353377
Extension: 2341
Fax: 7054345219

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashesh Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kumar (CPSO#: 82716 )
Business Address: 1405 Edward Street
Hearst Ontario P0L 1N0
(705) 362-4291
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000
Business Address: Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
(705) 435-6281
Business Address: 1000 - 366 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 4B2
(416) 722-3393
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121
Business Address: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
(905) 378-4647

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 33 Lombard St
Suite 3902
Toronto ON M5C 3H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054353377
Extension: 2341
Fax: 7054345219

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashesh Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kumar (CPSO#: 82716 )
Business Address: 1405 Edward Street
Hearst Ontario P0L 1N0
(705) 362-4291
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000
Business Address: Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
(705) 435-6281
Business Address: 1000 - 366 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 4B2
(416) 722-3393
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121
Business Address: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
(905) 378-4647

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHESH KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHESH KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005