THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:08:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Eye Care Centre
3460 Schmon Parkway
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 684-8521
Fax: (905) 684-4996

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adnan Pirbhai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pirbhai (CPSO#: 82732 )
Business Address: 3460 Schmon Parkway
Thorold Ontario L2Z 4Y6
(905) 684-8521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Eye Care Centre
3460 Schmon Parkway
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 684-8521
Fax: (905) 684-4996

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adnan Pirbhai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pirbhai (CPSO#: 82732 )
Business Address: 3460 Schmon Parkway
Thorold Ontario L2Z 4Y6
(905) 684-8521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADNAN PIRBHAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIRBHAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADNAN PIRBHAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIRBHAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005