THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:14:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 406
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 268-9928
Fax: (888) 972-4226

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chu (CPSO#: 82737 )
Business Address: 406 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 268-9928

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 406
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 268-9928
Fax: (888) 972-4226

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chu (CPSO#: 82737 )
Business Address: 406 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 268-9928

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY SHAN-LIN CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY SHAN-LIN CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005