THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:32:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Spadina Health Centre
Unit 404
720 Spadina Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5S 2T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 928-0920
Fax: (416) 928-7426
Address: Hassle-Free Clinic
2nd Floor
66 Gerrard Street East
Toronto Ontario M5B 1G3
Phone: (416) 922-0566
Fax: (416) 922-2018

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Ko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ko (CPSO#: 82749 )
Business Address: Spadina Health Centre
Unit 404
720 Spadina Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5S 2T9
(416) 928-0920
Business Address: Hassle-Free Clinic
2nd Floor
66 Gerrard Street East
Toronto Ontario M5B 1G3
(416) 922-0566
Business Address: 649 Sheppard Ave West
Toronto Ontario M3H 2S4
(416) 508-5691

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Spadina Health Centre
Unit 404
720 Spadina Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5S 2T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 928-0920
Fax: (416) 928-7426
Address: Hassle-Free Clinic
2nd Floor
66 Gerrard Street East
Toronto Ontario M5B 1G3
Phone: (416) 922-0566
Fax: (416) 922-2018

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Ko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ko (CPSO#: 82749 )
Business Address: Spadina Health Centre
Unit 404
720 Spadina Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5S 2T9
(416) 928-0920
Business Address: Hassle-Free Clinic
2nd Floor
66 Gerrard Street East
Toronto Ontario M5B 1G3
(416) 922-0566
Business Address: 649 Sheppard Ave West
Toronto Ontario M3H 2S4
(416) 508-5691

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN KO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN KO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005