THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:07:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12-585 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 4K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-746-6745
Fax: 613-746-6008

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Steeves Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Steeves (CPSO#: 82753 )
Business Address: 12-585 Montreal Rd
The Montfort Orthopaedic Group
Ottawa ON K1K 4K4
613-746-6749
Business Address: The Montfort Orthopaedic Group
202 - 595 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
(613) 746-6745
Business Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12-585 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 4K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-746-6745
Fax: 613-746-6008

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Steeves Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Steeves (CPSO#: 82753 )
Business Address: 12-585 Montreal Rd
The Montfort Orthopaedic Group
Ottawa ON K1K 4K4
613-746-6749
Business Address: The Montfort Orthopaedic Group
202 - 595 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
(613) 746-6745
Business Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ALEXANDER STEEVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEEVES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ALEXANDER STEEVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEEVES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005