THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:04:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 101
493 Lancaster Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2K 1L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 747-2172
Fax: (519) 571-1174
Address: 695 Block Line Rd
Winston Park LTC
Kitchener ON N2E 3K1
Phone: 519-576-2430
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie Maidment Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Maidment (CPSO#: 82768 )
Business Address: 229 Lexington Road
Waterloo Ontario N2K 2E1
(519) 885-0255
Business Address: 101 - 493 Lancaster Street West
Waterdown Ontario N2K 1L8
(519) 747-2172
Business Address: 695 Block Line Road
Village of Winston Park
Kitchener Ontario N2E 3X3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 101
493 Lancaster Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2K 1L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 747-2172
Fax: (519) 571-1174
Address: 695 Block Line Rd
Winston Park LTC
Kitchener ON N2E 3K1
Phone: 519-576-2430
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie Maidment Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Maidment (CPSO#: 82768 )
Business Address: 229 Lexington Road
Waterloo Ontario N2K 2E1
(519) 885-0255
Business Address: 101 - 493 Lancaster Street West
Waterdown Ontario N2K 1L8
(519) 747-2172
Business Address: 695 Block Line Road
Village of Winston Park
Kitchener Ontario N2E 3X3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE LYNNE MAIDMENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAIDMENT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE LYNNE MAIDMENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAIDMENT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005