THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:24:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rideau-Rockcliffe Family Medicine
595 Montreal Rd, Suite 400
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 695-6900
Fax: (613) 695-6464

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. C. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chow (CPSO#: 82774 )
Business Address: 595 Montreal Rd
Rideau-Rockcliffe Family Medicine
Suite 400
Ottawa ON K1K 4L2
613-695-6900 Extn: 1
Business Address: Suite 400
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
(613) 695-6900

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rideau-Rockcliffe Family Medicine
595 Montreal Rd, Suite 400
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 695-6900
Fax: (613) 695-6464

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. C. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chow (CPSO#: 82774 )
Business Address: 595 Montreal Rd
Rideau-Rockcliffe Family Medicine
Suite 400
Ottawa ON K1K 4L2
613-695-6900 Extn: 1
Business Address: Suite 400
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2
(613) 695-6900

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA CHRISTINE CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA CHRISTINE CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005