THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 03:37:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Infectious Diseases
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Extension: 6752
Fax: 9054727621

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 15 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 15 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeya T. Nadarajah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nadarajah (CPSO#: 82790 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 360-4000
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Infectious Diseases
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7000 Extn: 6752

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Infectious Diseases
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Extension: 6752
Fax: 9054727621

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 15 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 15 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeya T. Nadarajah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nadarajah (CPSO#: 82790 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 360-4000
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Infectious Diseases
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7000 Extn: 6752

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEYA THIRUMAGAL NADARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADARAJAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEYA THIRUMAGAL NADARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005