THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:01:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: Butt, Yolanda Ai-Hsin (Used Until: 03 Jul 2006)
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-605 Royal York Road
Toronto Ontario M8Y 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-901-7756
Fax: 647-350-3770

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yolanda Kirkham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Kirkham (CPSO#: 82799 )
Business Address: 605 Royal York Road
#203
Toronto Ontario M8Y 4G5
416-901-7756
Business Address: Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Department of Obstetrics & Gynecology
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6052

General Information

Former Name: Butt, Yolanda Ai-Hsin (Used Until: 03 Jul 2006)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-605 Royal York Road
Toronto Ontario M8Y 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-901-7756
Fax: 647-350-3770

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yolanda Kirkham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Kirkham (CPSO#: 82799 )
Business Address: 605 Royal York Road
#203
Toronto Ontario M8Y 4G5
416-901-7756
Business Address: Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Department of Obstetrics & Gynecology
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6052

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOLANDA AI-HSIN BUTT KIRKHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRKHAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOLANDA AI-HSIN BUTT KIRKHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRKHAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005