THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:29:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
Dept of Pathology
Suite 2H302
2200 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Extension: 4827
Fax: (905) 813-4132
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Pathology
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Valerie Dube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Dube (CPSO#: 82823 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Pathology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 2H302
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2696
Business Address: 115 Midair Crt
Brampton ON L6T 5M3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
Dept of Pathology
Suite 2H302
2200 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Extension: 4827
Fax: (905) 813-4132
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Pathology
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Valerie Dube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Dube (CPSO#: 82823 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Pathology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 2H302
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2696
Business Address: 115 Midair Crt
Brampton ON L6T 5M3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VALERIE DUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VALERIE DUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005