THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:24:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical Academy of Latvia, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, LATVIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vaughan Pain Clinic
3175 Rutherford Road Unit 23
Vaughan Ontario L4K 5Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 761-1288
Fax: (905) 761-2088

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Inese Robertus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Robertus (CPSO#: 82834 )
Business Address: 100-400 Applewood Cres
Concord ON L4K 0C3
905-883-1033
Business Address: Suite 23
3175 Rutherford Road
Vaughan Ontario L4K 5Y6
(905) 761-1288
Business Address: 847 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 3B4
(905) 581-5543
Business Address: Suite 22B
16715 Yonge Street
Newmarket Ontario L3X 1X4
(905) 898-4184

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, LATVIAN
Medical School: Medical Academy of Latvia, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vaughan Pain Clinic
3175 Rutherford Road Unit 23
Vaughan Ontario L4K 5Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 761-1288
Fax: (905) 761-2088

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Inese Robertus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Robertus (CPSO#: 82834 )
Business Address: 100-400 Applewood Cres
Concord ON L4K 0C3
905-883-1033
Business Address: Suite 23
3175 Rutherford Road
Vaughan Ontario L4K 5Y6
(905) 761-1288
Business Address: 847 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 3B4
(905) 581-5543
Business Address: Suite 22B
16715 Yonge Street
Newmarket Ontario L3X 1X4
(905) 898-4184

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. INESE ROBERTUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. INESE ROBERTUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical Academy of Latvia, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005