THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:34:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-240 Duncan Mill Rd
North York ON M3B 3S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-654-5437
Fax: 647-689-2371

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS
Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Press 1, 1, then 1 again
Fax: 1-877-398-5932
Date Received: 26 Aug 2023

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Ardeshiri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ardeshiri (CPSO#: 82835 )
Business Address: Suite 311
7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L3T 0C4
(905) 597-1051
Business Address: 311-7191 Yonge St
Thornhill ON L3T 0C4
Business Address: 240 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 3S6
416-654-5437

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-240 Duncan Mill Rd
North York ON M3B 3S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-654-5437
Fax: 647-689-2371

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS
Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Press 1, 1, then 1 again
Fax: 1-877-398-5932
Date Received: 26 Aug 2023

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Ardeshiri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ardeshiri (CPSO#: 82835 )
Business Address: Suite 311
7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L3T 0C4
(905) 597-1051
Business Address: 311-7191 Yonge St
Thornhill ON L3T 0C4
Business Address: 240 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 3S6
416-654-5437

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARNAZ ARDESHIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARDESHIRI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARNAZ ARDESHIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARDESHIRI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005