THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:04:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nagpur University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAYALAM, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 212
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 497-1987
Fax: (416) 497-0712
Address: Black Creek Community Health Centre
2202 Jane Street Unit 5
Toronto Ontario M3M 1A4
Phone: (416) 249-8000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Malini G. Dave Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dave (CPSO#: 82838 )
Business Address: 401 - 4800 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
(416) 497-1987
Business Address: 2202 Jane Street
North York Ontario M3M 1A4
(416) 249-8000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAYALAM, TAMIL
Medical School: Nagpur University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 212
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 497-1987
Fax: (416) 497-0712
Address: Black Creek Community Health Centre
2202 Jane Street Unit 5
Toronto Ontario M3M 1A4
Phone: (416) 249-8000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Malini G. Dave Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dave (CPSO#: 82838 )
Business Address: 401 - 4800 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
(416) 497-1987
Business Address: 2202 Jane Street
North York Ontario M3M 1A4
(416) 249-8000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALINI GOVIND DAVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALINI GOVIND DAVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nagpur University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005