THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:19:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 346 Platt's Lane
London ON N6G 1J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196729660
Fax: 5196727727

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saadia Hameed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jan (CPSO#: 82874 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Family Medical Centre
346 Platt's Lane
London Ontario N6G 1J1
(519) 672-9660 Extn: 67258

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 346 Platt's Lane
London ON N6G 1J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196729660
Fax: 5196727727

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saadia Hameed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jan (CPSO#: 82874 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Family Medical Centre
346 Platt's Lane
London Ontario N6G 1J1
(519) 672-9660 Extn: 67258

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAADIA NASREEN HAMEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMEED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAADIA NASREEN HAMEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMEED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005