THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:14:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
18-234
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165864800
Extension: 7859
Fax: 416-586-5113

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samir K. Sinha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sinha (CPSO#: 82878 )
Business Address: 600 University Ave
Suite 475
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
416-586-4800 Extn: 177856

Corporation Name: Dr. Samir K. Sinha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
18-234
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165864800
Extension: 7859
Fax: 416-586-5113

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samir K. Sinha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sinha (CPSO#: 82878 )
Business Address: 600 University Ave
Suite 475
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
416-586-4800 Extn: 177856

Corporation Name: Dr. Samir K. Sinha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIR KUMAR SINHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIR KUMAR SINHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005