THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:00:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Kerala, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAYALAM, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 304
1200 Markham Road
Toronto Ontario M1H 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 345-8627
Fax: (647) 345-8629

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Usha Harikumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Harikumar (CPSO#: 82880 )
Business Address: Suite 304
1200 Markham Road
Toronto Ontario M1H 3C3
(647) 345-8627

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAYALAM, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Kerala, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 304
1200 Markham Road
Toronto Ontario M1H 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 345-8627
Fax: (647) 345-8629

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Usha Harikumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Harikumar (CPSO#: 82880 )
Business Address: Suite 304
1200 Markham Road
Toronto Ontario M1H 3C3
(647) 345-8627

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. USHA HARIKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARIKUMAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. USHA HARIKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARIKUMAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Kerala, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005