THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:10:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakerdige Health Corporation
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 623-3331
Extension: 33312
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Advance Endoscopy and Specialist Centre
222 King St E
Suite 3100
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
Phone: 905 419 7007
Fax: 905 419 7008
Address: 2200-222 King St E
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
Phone: 905 440 3600
Fax: 905 697 7745
Address: Endoscopy
Taunton Surgical Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1J 8P5
Phone: 905-721-6860
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1031 Brock Rd
Pickering ON L1W 3T7
Phone: 9056831700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jul 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 23 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ahmed (CPSO#: 82887 )
Business Address: 47 Liberty St S
Bowmanville ON L1C 2N4
6474490950

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Sep 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakerdige Health Corporation
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 623-3331
Extension: 33312
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Advance Endoscopy and Specialist Centre
222 King St E
Suite 3100
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
Phone: 905 419 7007
Fax: 905 419 7008
Address: 2200-222 King St E
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
Phone: 905 440 3600
Fax: 905 697 7745
Address: Endoscopy
Taunton Surgical Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1J 8P5
Phone: 905-721-6860
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1031 Brock Rd
Pickering ON L1W 3T7
Phone: 9056831700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jul 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 23 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ahmed (CPSO#: 82887 )
Business Address: 47 Liberty St S
Bowmanville ON L1C 2N4
6474490950

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Sep 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISHTIAQ AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISHTIAQ AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005