THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:03:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HealthSource Medical Clinic
C1 Ground Floor
473 Dupont Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 588-1888
Fax: (416) 588-0388

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bowen Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chan (CPSO#: 82899 )
Business Address: HealthSource Medical Clinic
C1 Ground Floor
473 Dupont Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1Y6
(416) 588-1888

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HealthSource Medical Clinic
C1 Ground Floor
473 Dupont Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 588-1888
Fax: (416) 588-0388

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bowen Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chan (CPSO#: 82899 )
Business Address: HealthSource Medical Clinic
C1 Ground Floor
473 Dupont Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1Y6
(416) 588-1888

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BOWEN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BOWEN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005