THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:17:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Extension: 3674
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Pathology
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael D'Agostino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. D'Agostino (CPSO#: 82909 )
Business Address: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Extension: 3674
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Pathology
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael D'Agostino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. D'Agostino (CPSO#: 82909 )
Business Address: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL STEVEN D'AGOSTINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'AGOSTINO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL STEVEN D'AGOSTINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'AGOSTINO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 May 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005