THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:21:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: (416) 431-8204
Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W3W3
Phone: 4164952550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer L. Devon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Devon (CPSO#: 82912 )
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2550
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
c/o Emergency Department
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: (416) 431-8204
Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W3W3
Phone: 4164952550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer L. Devon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Devon (CPSO#: 82912 )
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2550
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
c/o Emergency Department
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LEAH DEVON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LEAH DEVON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005