THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:10:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 378 Huron St.
Stratford Ontario N5A 5T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 305-3550
Fax: (519) 305-3552
Address: 704 Mara Street. Unit 106
Point Edward Ontario N7V 1X4
Phone: 5193019427
Fax: 5193053552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graham Heaton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Heaton (CPSO#: 82930 )
Business Address: 378 Huron Street
Suite B
Stratford Ontario N5A 5T5
(519) 305-3550
Business Address: Suite 106
704 Mara Street
Point Edward Ontario N7V 1X4
(519) 542-6512
Business Address: 255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2P5
(519) 291-3120
Business Address: 98 Shipley Street
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
(519) 482-3440
Business Address: 46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 272-8210

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 378 Huron St.
Stratford Ontario N5A 5T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 305-3550
Fax: (519) 305-3552
Address: 704 Mara Street. Unit 106
Point Edward Ontario N7V 1X4
Phone: 5193019427
Fax: 5193053552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graham Heaton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Heaton (CPSO#: 82930 )
Business Address: 378 Huron Street
Suite B
Stratford Ontario N5A 5T5
(519) 305-3550
Business Address: Suite 106
704 Mara Street
Point Edward Ontario N7V 1X4
(519) 542-6512
Business Address: 255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2P5
(519) 291-3120
Business Address: 98 Shipley Street
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
(519) 482-3440
Business Address: 46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 272-8210

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAHAM WILLIAM HEATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEATON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAHAM WILLIAM HEATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEATON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005