THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 03:40:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
Medicine
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
Phone: 4164618272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C S McColl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. McColl (CPSO#: 82954 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B9
(905) 848-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
Medicine
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
Phone: 4164618272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C S McColl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. McColl (CPSO#: 82954 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B9
(905) 848-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER SCOTT MCCOLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCOLL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER SCOTT MCCOLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCOLL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005