THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:54:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 08 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: West Park Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melody Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nguyen (CPSO#: 82960 )
Business Address: 10023 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 1T7
4163359700
Business Address: UG25
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 08 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: West Park Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melody Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nguyen (CPSO#: 82960 )
Business Address: 10023 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 1T7
4163359700
Business Address: UG25
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELODY HONG HANH NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELODY HONG HANH NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Dec 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Dec 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005