THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:41:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: Organek, Alison (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Organek, Alison (Used Until: 27 Apr 2009)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 900-895 Don Mills Rd
North York ON M3C 1W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Apr 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alison Appelton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Appelton (CPSO#: 82965 )
Business Address: Peninsula Family Health Team
24 Moore Street
Lions Head Ontario N0H 1W0
(519) 793-4604
Business Address: 900-895 Don Mills Rd
North York ON M3C 1W3

General Information

Former Name: Organek, Alison (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Organek, Alison (Used Until: 27 Apr 2009)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 900-895 Don Mills Rd
North York ON M3C 1W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Apr 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alison Appelton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Appelton (CPSO#: 82965 )
Business Address: Peninsula Family Health Team
24 Moore Street
Lions Head Ontario N0H 1W0
(519) 793-4604
Business Address: 900-895 Don Mills Rd
North York ON M3C 1W3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISON ELLEN APPELTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APPELTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISON ELLEN APPELTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APPELTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005