THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:32:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Summerville Family Health Team
Etobicoke Site
Suite 211
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 621-9700
Fax: (416) 621-4438
Address: 190 sherway drive
sute 402
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5W2
Phone: 647 340 7274
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pari Oza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Oza (CPSO#: 82966 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Summerville Family Health Team
Etobicoke Site
Suite 211
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 621-9700
Fax: (416) 621-4438
Address: 190 sherway drive
sute 402
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5W2
Phone: 647 340 7274
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pari Oza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Oza (CPSO#: 82966 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARI UPENDRA OZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARI UPENDRA OZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005