THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 16:03:05 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 303
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 345-2126
Fax: (647) 345-2110
Address: 700 Lawrence Ave W
Suite 360
North York ON M6A 3B4
Phone: 646-812-2113
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 305 Milner Ave
Suite 920
Scarborough Ontario M1B 3V4
Phone: (416) 321-3883
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 308-2175 Sheppard Ave E
Toronto Ontario M2J1W8
Phone: (416) 638-5889
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 450-5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto Ontario M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 322-7517
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vishal Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Patel (CPSO#: 82971 )
Business Address: 920 - 305 Milner Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1B 3V4
(416) 321-3883
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Address: 308 - 2175 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2J 1W8
(416) 638-5889
Business Address: 303 - 4800 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
(647) 345-2126

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 303
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 345-2126
Fax: (647) 345-2110
Address: 700 Lawrence Ave W
Suite 360
North York ON M6A 3B4
Phone: 646-812-2113
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 305 Milner Ave
Suite 920
Scarborough Ontario M1B 3V4
Phone: (416) 321-3883
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 308-2175 Sheppard Ave E
Toronto Ontario M2J1W8
Phone: (416) 638-5889
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 450-5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto Ontario M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 322-7517
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vishal Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Patel (CPSO#: 82971 )
Business Address: 920 - 305 Milner Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1B 3V4
(416) 321-3883
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Address: 308 - 2175 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2J 1W8
(416) 638-5889
Business Address: 303 - 4800 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
(647) 345-2126

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VISHAL PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VISHAL PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005