THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:32:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 10
2563 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 2E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-553-3382
Fax: 905-553-3313
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Mackenzie Health
(Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital)
3200 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 905-417-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mackenzie Health
(Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital)
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-2310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nikila Ravindran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ravindran (CPSO#: 82976 )
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
905-417-2000
Business Address: 2563 Major Mackenzie Dr
Unit 10
Maple ON L6A 2E8
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 10
2563 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 2E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-553-3382
Fax: 905-553-3313
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Mackenzie Health
(Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital)
3200 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 905-417-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mackenzie Health
(Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital)
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-2310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nikila Ravindran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ravindran (CPSO#: 82976 )
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
905-417-2000
Business Address: 2563 Major Mackenzie Dr
Unit 10
Maple ON L6A 2E8
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIKILA COMONDORE RAVINDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVINDRAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIKILA COMONDORE RAVINDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVINDRAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005