THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:28:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd.
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 33200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine Anne MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. MacDonald (CPSO#: 82978 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
399 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd.
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 33200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine Anne MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. MacDonald (CPSO#: 82978 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
399 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ANNE MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ANNE MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005