THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:59:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P.O Box 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054727000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thirugnanam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Thirugnanam (CPSO#: 82990 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(647) 204-5921

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P.O Box 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054727000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thirugnanam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Thirugnanam (CPSO#: 82990 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(647) 204-5921

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUBARNA THIRUGNANAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIRUGNANAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUBARNA THIRUGNANAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIRUGNANAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005