THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:54:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12-419 Dundas St E
Waterdown ON L8B 0K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nermin Whitney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Whitney (CPSO#: 83004 )
Business Address: 12 - 419 Dundas Street East
Waterdown Ontario L8B 0K4
(905) 689-2655

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12-419 Dundas St E
Waterdown ON L8B 0K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nermin Whitney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Whitney (CPSO#: 83004 )
Business Address: 12 - 419 Dundas Street East
Waterdown Ontario L8B 0K4
(905) 689-2655

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NERMIN AYOUB WHITNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITNEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NERMIN AYOUB WHITNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITNEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005