THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:03:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: Woods, Stacy Ann (Used Until: 11 Jul 2007)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Great Northern Family Health Team
240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 647-6100
Fax: (705) 6470173

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stacy Desilets Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Desilets (CPSO#: 83007 )
Business Address: 2-240 Shepherdson Rd
New Liskeard ON P0J 1P0
Business Address: P O Box 1355
240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
(705) 647-6100
Business Address: 20 May Street
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
(705) 647-4444
Business Address: 421 Shepherdson Avenue
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
(705) 647-8121

General Information

Former Name: Woods, Stacy Ann (Used Until: 11 Jul 2007)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Great Northern Family Health Team
240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 647-6100
Fax: (705) 6470173

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stacy Desilets Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Desilets (CPSO#: 83007 )
Business Address: 2-240 Shepherdson Rd
New Liskeard ON P0J 1P0
Business Address: P O Box 1355
240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
(705) 647-6100
Business Address: 20 May Street
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
(705) 647-4444
Business Address: 421 Shepherdson Avenue
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
(705) 647-8121

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STACY ANN DESILETS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESILETS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STACY ANN DESILETS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESILETS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005