THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:32:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
9N-949
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4800
Extension: 6529
Fax: 416-340-3660

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 01 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yeung (CPSO#: 83009 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Room 9N-983
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 6529

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
9N-949
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4800
Extension: 6529
Fax: 416-340-3660

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 01 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yeung (CPSO#: 83009 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Room 9N-983
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 6529

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN CHI-WAI YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN CHI-WAI YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005