THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:37:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4040 Finch Ave E
Unit 108
Scarborough ON M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-293-3233
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 920 Princess Street
Unit 110
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H1
Phone: 613-547-9172
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 310 Bridge Street West
Unit G4
Napanee Ontario K7R 0A4
Phone: 343-276-0177
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 204-6453 Morrison St
Niagara Falls ON L2E 7H1
Phone: 905-374-6453
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1840 Woodward Drive
Suite 2A
Ottawa Ontario K2C 0P7
Phone: 613-722-9900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 14 Isabella Street
Perth Ontario K7H 2W6
Phone: 343-341-5550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jane Yuan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yuan (CPSO#: 83011 )
Business Address: 108-4040 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON M1S 4V5
(416) 293-3233

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4040 Finch Ave E
Unit 108
Scarborough ON M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-293-3233
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 920 Princess Street
Unit 110
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H1
Phone: 613-547-9172
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 310 Bridge Street West
Unit G4
Napanee Ontario K7R 0A4
Phone: 343-276-0177
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 204-6453 Morrison St
Niagara Falls ON L2E 7H1
Phone: 905-374-6453
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1840 Woodward Drive
Suite 2A
Ottawa Ontario K2C 0P7
Phone: 613-722-9900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 14 Isabella Street
Perth Ontario K7H 2W6
Phone: 343-341-5550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jane Yuan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yuan (CPSO#: 83011 )
Business Address: 108-4040 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON M1S 4V5
(416) 293-3233

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANE YUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANE YUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005