THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 07:04:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: Jongerius, Amy Jeanne (Used Until: 15 Aug 2010)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Saugeen Shores Medical Building
36 Grey Street North
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 797-9940
Fax: (519) 797-1225
Address: 340 High Street
Brightshores Health System - Southampton Hospital
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Phone: (519) 797-3230
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amy Gowan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gowan (CPSO#: 83017 )
Business Address: 340 High Street
Brightshores Health System - Southampton Hospital
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
(519) 797-3230
Business Address: Saugeen Shores Medical Building
36 Grey Street North
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
(519) 797-9940

General Information

Former Name: Jongerius, Amy Jeanne (Used Until: 15 Aug 2010)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Saugeen Shores Medical Building
36 Grey Street North
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 797-9940
Fax: (519) 797-1225
Address: 340 High Street
Brightshores Health System - Southampton Hospital
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Phone: (519) 797-3230
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amy Gowan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gowan (CPSO#: 83017 )
Business Address: 340 High Street
Brightshores Health System - Southampton Hospital
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
(519) 797-3230
Business Address: Saugeen Shores Medical Building
36 Grey Street North
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
(519) 797-9940

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMY JEANNE GOWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOWAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMY JEANNE GOWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOWAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005