THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:34:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lagos, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2757 King Street East
St. Joseph's HealthCare - CAHS
Hamilton Regional Eye Institute
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 573 7777
Extension: 38311
Fax: 905 573 4810
Address: 238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z3
Phone: 905 871 6737
Fax: 905 871 9893

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.A. Sogbesan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sogbesan (CPSO#: 83021 )
Business Address: 238 Bertie St
Douglas Memorial Hospital Medical Center
Fort Erie ON L2A 1Z3
905 871 6737
Business Address: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
King's Campus
Regional Eye Institute
2757 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Lagos, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2757 King Street East
St. Joseph's HealthCare - CAHS
Hamilton Regional Eye Institute
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 573 7777
Extension: 38311
Fax: 905 573 4810
Address: 238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z3
Phone: 905 871 6737
Fax: 905 871 9893

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.A. Sogbesan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sogbesan (CPSO#: 83021 )
Business Address: 238 Bertie St
Douglas Memorial Hospital Medical Center
Fort Erie ON L2A 1Z3
905 871 6737
Business Address: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
King's Campus
Regional Eye Institute
2757 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ENITAN ADEDOLAPO SOGBESAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOGBESAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ENITAN ADEDOLAPO SOGBESAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOGBESAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2005